Financial history GREAT HOLLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £7.33k £13.85k £15.00k £14.41k £15.56k
Total expenditure £13.22k £4.53k £22.00k £11.50k £8.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k N/A N/A N/A