Financial history LAMARSH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.52k £22.19k £17.56k £10.49k £15.07k
Total expenditure £20.31k £11.02k £26.28k £12.52k £12.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.20k £20.58k £9.20k £7.00k N/A