LAMARSH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities for local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 29 August 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Neal | Chair | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan William kerr | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Cooke | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John William Harrod | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Chambers | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ADEDOTUN | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MORRIS | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.52k | £22.19k | £17.56k | £10.49k | £15.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.31k | £11.02k | £26.28k | £12.52k | £12.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.20k | £20.58k | £9.20k | £7.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 28TH DECEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
LAMARSH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glen Gari
Henny Road
Lamarsh
Bures
CO8 5EU
- Phone:
- 01787 228707
- Email:
- glengari@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window