Trustees LAMARSH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Neal Chair 14 October 2019
None on record
Alan William kerr Trustee 03 April 2023
None on record
Christine Cooke Trustee 06 September 2018
None on record
John William Harrod Trustee 06 September 2018
None on record
Jane Chambers Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
FIONA ADEDOTUN Trustee 24 September 2015
None on record
DAVID MORRIS Trustee 24 September 2015
None on record