ABRIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides the uses of the hall for the benefit for the young and old. I.E. meetings, art, dancing, sports, weddings, birthdays, christenings, keep fit and funerals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 12 December 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE ELLEN MYSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hazel Moore | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Harris | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kellie Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Garner | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Drewe | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Terence Harding | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Antony Hand | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Danny William Blain | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN GWYNNETH COMBER | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Marc Drewe | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Fennell | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD FOURACRES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.73k | £5.88k | £37.80k | £39.16k | £46.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.35k | £28.36k | £30.67k | £30.70k | £42.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 December 2020 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 December 2020 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1963
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
ABRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Ongar Road
Abridge
ROMFORD
RM4 1UD
- Phone:
- 07950608129
- Email:
- BEV-SUZ@TISCALI.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window