Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.28k £17.87k £18.59k £23.07k £16.20k
Total expenditure £25.31k £10.99k £11.04k £12.30k £26.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.55k £10.30k £8.00k £2.67k N/A