THE MARGARETTING RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides accommodation to facilitate clubs and organisations beneficial to the local community and beyond. It also has a playing field utilised by both sports clubs and other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 12 September 1963: Standard registration
- MARGARETTING VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- THE MARGARETTING RECREATION GROUP AND VILLAGE HALL TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Di Smith | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRAY | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Jim Bull | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
BOB CULLITON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENNY DOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.40k | £20.21k | £25.71k | £19.06k | £19.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.10k | £27.83k | £22.15k | £29.92k | £21.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.43k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24TH JULY 1969
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND AND FACILITIES ANCILLARY THERETO AND A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MARGARETTING AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Woodfield Cottages
High Street
INGATESTONE
Essex
CM4 0DY
- Phone:
- 07794187741
- Website:
-
margarettingvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window