Financial history NOAK HILL VICTORY HALL

Charity number: 301373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.03k £23.73k £15.63k £14.38k £19.57k
Total expenditure £9.96k £7.59k £8.53k £10.86k £10.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.24k £8.00k N/A N/A