RETTENDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bingo, Pre-school, Horticultural Meetings, Parish council metings, Jive Club, childrens parties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 13 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
edward cheater | Chair | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Dale | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Wright | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Cheater | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
kathryn clark | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
peter maloney | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARJORIE SANKEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT PREBBLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.64k | £13.34k | £7.79k | £14.82k | £14.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.21k | £6.41k | £13.76k | £11.77k | £11.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1963
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF RETTENDON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
RETTENDON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
rettendon village hall
Main Road
Rettendon Common
CHELMSFORD
CM3 8DR
- Phone:
- 01268730519
- Email:
- edwardcheater@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window