Financial history ROXWELL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 301385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.63k £20.65k £17.98k £24.46k £24.48k
Total expenditure £18.91k £19.78k £20.61k £23.73k £30.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A