Trustees ROXWELL MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 301385

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faye Adele Copping | Chair | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Coppen | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Blackburn | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mansell Wallace | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Nixon | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judith Nicola Woolley | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barry DIXON | Trustee | 15 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLYNN MERVYN COGDALE EASTMAN | Trustee | 25 May 2000 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.