ROYDON PLAYING FIELDS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining the playing fields in order that residents may use this parcel of land for recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 01 January 1963: Standard registration
- ROYDON SPORTS AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roydon Parish Council | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.04k | £3.04k | £2.57k | £3.23k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £3.74k | £1.75k | £3.62k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 June 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD OF 13TH JANUARY 1859 DEEDS OF GIFT DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1950 AND 1ST FEBRUARY 1952, AS AMENDED 4TH JULY 1994
Charitable objects
A SPORTS AND RECREATION GROUND AND CHILDRENS PLAYING GROUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roydon Village Hall
Harlow Road
Roydon
HARLOW
Essex
CM19 5HH
- Phone:
- 07916 288226
- Email:
- Clerk@roydonessex.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window