SHOTGATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for use by the Shotgate community and surrounding area. Actitivities include play group, over 50s club, table tennis, wine club, gardening club etc. Shotgate Community Hall is available for hire for private functions weddings, parties etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 12 August 1968: Standard registration
- SHOTGATE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SHELLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR A URSULL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR T CAREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.16k | £30.33k | £44.13k | £41.13k | £45.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.57k | £21.88k | £47.71k | £47.71k | £47.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £12.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST OCTOBER 1973 AND AS AMENDED 27TH OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN SHOTGATE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
SHOTGATE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 SANDOWN ROAD
WICKFORD
SS11 8PA
- Phone:
- 01268766571
- Email:
- marionspellman@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window