SOUTHEND ON SEA UNIT 312 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable purpose of the Unit is to promote the development of young people aged 10 to 18years, in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 08 April 1963: Standard registration
- SOUTHEND-ON-SEA SEA CADET CORPS (Working name)
- T S IMPLACABLE - SOUTHEND SEA CADETS (Working name)
- NO 312 SOUTHEND ON SEA UNIT SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN FREIDRICH | Chair | 20 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
Janis Hicks-King | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Hicks-King | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dawes | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Srnkova | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
myles kenton hilbery | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph McGuigan | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER KEMP | Trustee | 04 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY MORGAN | Trustee | 01 October 2004 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.58k | £20.66k | £32.94k | £20.08k | £44.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.31k | £14.78k | £36.02k | £12.50k | £55.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.91k | £11.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
SOUTHEND ON SEA AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Central Avenue
BENFLEET
Essex
SS7 2NP
- Phone:
- 07775927654
- Email:
- southend312@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window