Trustees CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301405

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN ROBERTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clair Torres | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Barnard | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Long | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Alexander | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hatcher | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tory Melhuish | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenny Bentham | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Ivan Lambert | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|||||
SAM COLEY | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joan Lockett | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|||||
CAROL LINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.