Financial history THAXTED PUBLIC TENNIS COURTS FUND

Charity number: 301412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.29k £18.49k £18.62k £13.55k £15.85k
Total expenditure £3.23k £6.29k £83.34k £13.55k £11.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.96k N/A N/A N/A