UPSHIRE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is to maintain Upshire Village Hall, for the communal benefit of the inhabitants of the village and its surrounds. The committee aims to provide first class hall facilities at an affordable cost to voluntary organisations serving the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 19 June 1963: Standard registration
- 20 May 2022: Funds received from 1082427 UPSHIRE MILLENNIUM TRUST
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREDRICK CORSHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Wendy May Crawley | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.49k | £42.18k | £34.39k | £82.52k | £36.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.07k | £18.13k | £55.31k | £90.47k | £25.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £27.41k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1929
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
HAMLET OF UPSHIRE AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Upshire Village Hall
Horseshoe Hill
Upshire
Waltham Abbey
Essex
EN9 3SP
- Phone:
- 07432532621
- Email:
- upshirevillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window