Woodham Mortimer and Hazeleigh Village Hall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity oversees the provision and upkeep of the Village Hall and associated recreational ground for the benefit of the inhabitants of the locality with an emphasis on their education and wellbeing as specified in the original trust deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 15 December 1965: Standard registration
- WOODHAM MORTIMER AND HAZELEIGH VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- WOODHAM MORTIMER VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY NICHOLAS | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
KEITH IAN MCDONALD | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Jane Macmorland | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Granger | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
PAULINE MCDONALD | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
COLIN ANTHONY CRANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ADRIAN JAMES BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS ANN HOATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANN ELIZABETH BECKWITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £1.81k | £14.46k | £2.12k | £3.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57k | £3.03k | £5.27k | £2.80k | £3.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.49k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF CONVEYANCE AND DISCHARGE DATED 13TH MARCH 1946 as amended on 21 May 2024
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WOODHAM MORTIMER AND HAZELEIGH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Onemana
Alde House Drive
Aldeburgh
IP15 5EE
- Phone:
- 01728453427
- Email:
- adrianbrown@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window