WRITTLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administer The Beryl Platt Centre, Writtle for the benefit of the inhabitants of Writtle
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 02 February 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Percival | Chair | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
RALPH BRAY | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeni Collins | Trustee | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Steadman | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Renato Giuseppe Schmid | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Mrs Val Wilson | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.53k | £57.32k | £60.41k | £56.56k | £60.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.92k | £45.31k | £53.16k | £48.89k | £53.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £3.67k | £6.50k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST OCTOBER 1967 AS AMENDED 25TH APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WRITTLE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Beryl Platt Centre
12-14 Redwood Drive
Writtle
CHELMSFORD
CM1 3LY
- Phone:
- 07787479228
- Email:
- wcaoffice1214@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window