Trustees BROOKTHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL JAMES BONE Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Gillian Richards Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record
Annabelle Gaze Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
Lauren Amon Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
VICTORIA SMART Trustee 15 May 2015
None on record
LYNDA KING Trustee 04 April 2015
None on record