ST MARK'S AND HESTER'S WAY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide amenities for the residents of the local community and others who wish to use the centre as a meeting place, to run activities, and social events,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN JAMES CASSIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DESMOND GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.56k | £57.12k | £52.01k | £69.52k | £52.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.41k | £35.72k | £45.57k | £61.39k | £69.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.36k | £19.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/04/1975 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/1992 AS AMENDED ON 31/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 29/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ST MARK'S, HESTERS WAY, HATHERLEY, LANSDOWN AND ST PETER'S WARDS OF CHELTENHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY), IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
THE ST MARK'S, HESTERS WAY, HATHERLEY, LANSDOWN AND ST PETER'S WARDS OF CHELTENHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Janes Insolvency Practitioners
Priory Lodge
London Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 6HH
- Phone:
- 01242690025
- Email:
- stmarksca4@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window