Financial history COMPTON ABDALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.27k £19.79k £17.63k £6.26k £8.05k
Total expenditure £15.80k £17.55k £10.51k £16.13k £8.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.34k £11.71k N/A N/A