COMPTON ABDALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Venue for village and other local organisations to meet. Updated toilet faclities, provision for the disabled. Modern electric heating, kitchen facilities. vehicle parking. Womens Institute, Residents Club, Church of England for meetings, Annual Parish Meeting, Fete Committee, Local Players Group for rehearsals. Cotswold District Council for elections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 03 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Murray Laurence Robert Beamish | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Keith Stuart Jordan | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Sykes | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Brian Leslie Main Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.27k | £19.79k | £17.63k | £6.26k | £8.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.80k | £17.55k | £10.51k | £16.13k | £8.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.34k | £11.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MARCH 1949.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COMPTON ABDALE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fern Cottage
Compton Abdale
Cheltenham
GL54 4DR
- Phone:
- 01242890272
- Email:
- brianlmsmith@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window