Accounts and annual returns CORSE AND STAUNTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 14 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required