VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides village hall facilities for hire. Maintains village hall.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,811
Total expenditure: £12,769

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DAGLINGWORTH VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynn Abrahams Trustee 04 June 2024
None on record
Richard Kent Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Ena Dix Trustee 08 May 2014
None on record
MS MILES Trustee 04 September 2013
None on record
WENDY McCormick Trustee 16 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.28k £19.35k £12.76k £17.61k £20.81k
Total expenditure £18.70k £14.96k £7.17k £16.47k £12.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 March 2024 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Village Hall
Overley Road
Daglingworth
Cirencester
Glos
GL7 7AA
Phone:
07734437045