DOYNTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a hall for village activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 October 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Sherman | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna May Bond | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sofia Ellis | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Graham Jones | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Merrall | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
LINDSAY MARY GEORGIOU | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA LANDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.82k | £12.18k | £15.06k | £17.53k | £22.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.96k | £7.63k | £10.45k | £16.50k | £20.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 1937AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DOYNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Doynton Village Hall
Tog Hill Lane
Doynton
Bristol
South Glos
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window