Financial history DRYBROOK MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 301521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.43k £21.90k £8.16k £19.34k £19.85k
Total expenditure £19.27k £12.32k £12.24k £17.78k £18.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A