FRAMPTON COTTERELL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants of Frampton Cotterell and District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,100 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 January 1971: Standard registration
- 30 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Branton | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Humphreys | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bain | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Knight | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.14k | £75.80k | £69.33k | £64.47k | £72.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.52k | £40.91k | £63.89k | £67.89k | £69.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.93k | £24.01k | N/A | £8.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 15TH FEBRUARY 1968 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF 13TH MAY 1985 AS AMENDED 8 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
FRAMPTON COTTERELL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crossbow House
School Road
Frampton Cotterell
BRISTOL
BS36 2DA
- Phone:
- 01454 772947
- Email:
- crossbowhouse@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window