FRETHERNE WITH SAUL AND FRAMILODE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hall used by local groups - Playgroup, Sports, Parish Council, WI, Yoga, Aerobics, hire to public. Playing Field used for football training by local club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 October 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN CARTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma Greenwood | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jess Slate | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brock | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bartlett | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN KITCHING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.97k | £18.12k | £14.50k | £5.61k | £6.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.79k | £13.75k | £7.76k | £9.81k | £10.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £8.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2024 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2024 | 664 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 February 2022 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2021 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JUNE 1951.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FRETHERNE WITH SAUL AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROSPECT PLACE
HIGH STREET
SAUL
GLOUCESTER
GL2 7LW
- Phone:
- 07958124421
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window