MACKENZIE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall and its surrounding land for the population of Hewelsfield, Brockweir,and district for meetings,lectures,educational classes and organised events. Facility to play indoor bowls,yoga, tennis and other physical activities. Both indoor and outside activities for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 27 September 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENNIS EDWARD SKINNER | Chair | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GLYNN-JONES | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA MARGARET DAVIES | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LEWIS | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STOCK | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ALLATT | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY AUBREY FRANK SUMMERS | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA ELIZABETH RUSH | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EDWIN TRIGG | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURA BEDDIS | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.92k | £17.16k | £20.73k | £15.66k | £24.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.24k | £14.02k | £29.82k | £14.19k | £24.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £200 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATED BY SCHEME SEALED 29TH JULY 1994, AMENDED 2005. AS AMENDED ON 21 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTANANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE PARISH OF HEWLESFIELD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY (HEREIN AFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS POF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HEWELSFIELD AND BROCKWEIR AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle-A-Booth
Brockweir
CHEPSTOW
NP16 7NW
- Phone:
- 01291689604
- Email:
- castleabooth@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window