Trustees MACKENZIE HALL
Charity number: 301547

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENNIS EDWARD SKINNER | Chair | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GLYNN-JONES | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA MARGARET DAVIES | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LEWIS | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STOCK | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ALLATT | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY AUBREY FRANK SUMMERS | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA ELIZABETH RUSH | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EDWIN TRIGG | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURA BEDDIS | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.