KINGSWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kingswood Community Centre is a local community centre established in 1946 to provide the people of Kingswood and the surrounding area with a place to participate in activities and to provide accommodation for groups/people to hire and meet and share interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 November 1962: Standard registration
- K C A (Working name)
- KCA (Working name)
- KINGSWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lloyd Pickup | Chair | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MARTIN HAMBLIN | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.86k | £54.42k | £58.66k | £88.53k | £98.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.08k | £25.58k | £56.66k | £95.89k | £107.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 29 JANUARY 1979 AND 1 MARCH 1982.
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE BEBEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY MEANS OF ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS 2 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
KINGSWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY CENTRE
THE ARCH
HIGH STREET
KINGSWOOD
BRISTOL
BS15 4AB
- Phone:
- 01179674120
- Email:
- kca.admin@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window