Financial history LONGLEVENS VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.89k £23.12k £6.35k £5.08k £7.47k
Total expenditure £4.50k £4.36k £4.80k £4.53k £5.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.67k N/A N/A N/A