JOYS GREEN RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a recreation ground and children's play area for the benefit of the inhabitants of the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 January 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pam Konopka | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Hayne | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martha Howells | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benet McNamara | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Adams | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peggy McNamara | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Brooks | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Games | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Hufman | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Stevens | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/01/2020 | 08/01/2021 | 08/01/2022 | 08/01/2023 | 08/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £6.86k | £11.48k | £8.85k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £925 | £9.36k | £31.04k | £27.08k | £1.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2020 | 03 August 2021 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME OF 18 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, WITH THE PURPOSES OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF JOYS GREEN, IN THE PARISH OF LYDBROOK
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 School Crescent
School Road
Joys Green
LYDBROOK
Gloucestershire
GL17 9RN
- Phone:
- 07465440430
- Email:
- tabbyorwin@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window