VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meeting point for various Village activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 September 1962: Standard registration
- NAUNTON VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Ruth Pinner | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Suzanne Gibberson | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Russell | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Bentley | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nikky Shergold | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Patrick Nesbitt | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Cossey | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA HILDA BOULT | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.18k | £20.96k | £14.20k | £6.76k | £82.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.05k | £2.96k | £10.92k | £16.81k | £76.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.60k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 26 APRIL 1937
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NAUNTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring House
Naunton
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL54 3AT
- Phone:
- 07798 791373
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
nauntonvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window