Financial history NEWENT MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 301583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £18.06k £26.96k £14.70k £20.69k £20.30k
Total expenditure £11.17k £8.41k £11.94k £17.56k £18.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k N/A N/A N/A