REDBROOK VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Redbrook Village Hall seeks to contribute towards the identity and sustainability of the rural community of Redbrook, by the provision of a safe, secure and welcoming environment, which is accessible to all sections of the local community for social, recreational and educational purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £8,498
Total expenditure: £37,789

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin John Rushby Chair 08 October 2016
None on record
Mike Anthony Warren Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Steve Wareham Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Bridget Purvis Trustee 10 October 2015
THE METHODIST CIRCUIT OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Received: On time
Martyn Tyler Trustee 08 November 2010
None on record
Valerie Southall Trustee 02 May 2009
None on record
Linda Park Trustee 01 November 2001
None on record
Sylvia Adcock Trustee 03 November 1991
None on record
Jim Dunn Trustee 03 November 1991
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.44k £22.61k £12.19k £9.02k £8.50k
Total expenditure £11.03k £6.76k £10.31k £8.92k £37.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.60k £4.47k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 June 2024 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 09 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 TINMANS GREEN
REDBROOK
MONMOUTH
NP25 4NB
Phone:
01600719109