OLVESTON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaches young members about the countryside, enviroment and agriculture, through talks visits and competitions. Meetings take place once a week. Club does much for the local community and fundraises for itself as well as many other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 September 1972: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY ROSE BALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN TERRENCE PIERCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.16k | £2.42k | £3.27k | £9.43k | £5.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.40k | £1.88k | £3.40k | £8.79k | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JUNE, 1972.
Charitable objects
A YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB
Area of benefit
OLVESTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLOS AND N AVON FED OF YFC'S
AGRICULTURE HOUSE
TEWKESBURY ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL2 9AS
- Phone:
- 01452526032
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window