KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage and look after King George V Memorial Hall on behalf of the residents of Rangeworthy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 July 1968: Standard registration
- RANGEWORTHY HALL FUND (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Royds | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Eastment | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
FIONNA JANE LAYTON VOSPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC WILLIAM BRIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.78k | £22.20k | £10.56k | £12.96k | £16.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.88k | £16.74k | £13.23k | £18.59k | £15.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1ST JANUARY 1937
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RANGEWORTHY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Gloucester Road
Thornbury
BRISTOL
BS35 1JQ
- Phone:
- 07789513950
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window