CENTRE 67 STOW-ON-THE-WOLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Centre 67 - Stow Youth Club provides a safe space for the young people of Stow & surrounding villages to come and have fun. Our club is equipped for a wide range of arts, crafts, cooking & sports activities. Stow Youth Club's aims are to encourage friendship, build trust, explore new activities, develop skills, gain independence & confidence. Our attendees are 4 - 16 years of age & all abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 February 1969: Standard registration
- STOW YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Green | Chair | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Samantha Busby | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Pamela Sibun | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Joynes | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Coleman | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Claire Hamilton | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.74k | £12.74k | £23.87k | £25.62k | £25.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.80k | £18.66k | £20.32k | £32.66k | £21.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.26k | N/A | £6.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £1.27k | £1.50k | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND LEASE DATED 1 JANUARY 1968, AS AMENDED 9 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
YOUTH CLUB
Area of benefit
STOW-IN-THE-WOLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stow Youth Club
Fosseway
Stow On The Wold
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL54 1DW
- Phone:
- 01451830089
- Email:
- franham007@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window