TAYNTON AND TIBBERTON VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilities for recreation and other leisure-time activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 October 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Elizabeth Chappell | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROBERT Ashwell | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HYLARY ANNE KINGHAM | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.58k | £36.78k | £17.43k | £17.43k | £12.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £25.25k | £8.98k | £8.98k | £11.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.24k | £10.10k | £2.78k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 04 JAN 1984 as amended on 17 Feb 2014 as amended on 21 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF TAYNTON AND TIBBERTON AND THE NEIRBOURHOOD THEREOF OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (3) A RECREATION GROUND OR PLAYING FIELD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF TAYNTON AND TIBBERTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Taynton and Tibberton Village Hall
Taynton Lane
Taynton
GL19 3AN
- Phone:
- 01452790478
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window