Financial history TIDENHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION TRUST

Charity Number: 301640
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.41k £20.34k £20.09k £19.68k £19.68k
Total expenditure £12.63k £27.03k £11.36k £45.30k £45.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A