TIDENHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of village hall for parish events, meetings, social activities together with recreation ground for sporting activities. The geographical area covered is the parish of Tidenham although the use of the facilities is open to all for booking events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 October 1962: Standard registration
- RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- TIDENHAM WAR MEMORIAL AND RECREATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Teresa Badcock | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cannon | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juliet Hynes | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
EMILY VAN DER HEIJDEN | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Natalie Morgan | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||
ALISTAIR RUTHERFORD | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Evans | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEX FORD | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Haydn Bynon | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.41k | £20.34k | £20.09k | £19.68k | £19.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.63k | £27.03k | £11.36k | £45.30k | £45.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED 3RD JULY 2008. as amended on 01 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
1) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TIDENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tidenham Memorial Hall
Coleford Road
Tutshill
Chepstow
NP16 7BN
- Phone:
- 07980264033
- Website:
-
tidenhammemorialhall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window