Trustees VILLAGE HALL - WITHINGTON

Charity Number: 301655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Smith Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Brendan Joseph Robert Brown Trustee 02 August 2024
None on record
GLENYS WEBB Trustee 29 July 2024
None on record
Clive Pengelly Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Jacque Dent Trustee 13 October 2011
None on record