Accounts and annual returns YOUTH HOSTELS ASSOCIATION (ENGLAND AND WALES)

Charity Number: 301657
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2005 30 December 2005 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 22 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2004 24 January 2005 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 24 January 2005 26 days late