Governing document YOUTH HOSTELS ASSOCIATION (ENGLAND AND WALES)
Charity Number: 301657
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1933 AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 1976, 9 APRIL 1983, 9 NOVEMBER 1985, 5 APRIL 1986, 16 APRIL 1988 AND 17 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 13 NOVEMBER 1998 AND 22ND SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO HELP ALL, ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS TO A GREATER KNOWLEDGE, LOVE AND CARE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE, PARTICULARLY PROVIDING HOSTELS OR OTHER SIMPLE ACCOMMODATION FOR THEM IN THEIR TRAVELS: AND THUS TO PROMOTE THEIR HEALTH, REST AND EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.