GLOUCESTERSHIRE FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMER'S CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To advance the education of youbg members of the public in agriculture, homecrafts, country life and related subjects b) in the interests of social welfare to provide and promote the provision of facilities for recreation, to improve conditions of life, encourage self reliance and individual responsibility so that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 April 1963: Standard registration
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND NORTH AVON FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMER'S CLUBS (Previous name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMER'S CLUBS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Grey | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Millie Webb | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bronte Johnson | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Rice | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Higginson | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Albutt | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Elliott | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Smart | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Graham | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dickenson | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lily Giddings | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Jane Austin | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elena Westaway | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keaton Greenwood | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Jackson | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Burrows | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Atkinson | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Sellar | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Smith | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Ractliffe | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Cupper | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Morgan | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Harvey | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lyons | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.31k | £43.43k | £33.15k | £62.63k | £72.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.51k | £36.40k | £32.94k | £58.97k | £54.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 3RD NOVEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 2ND NOVEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED ON 27 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND NORTH AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Agricultural House
Greville Close
Sandhurst Road
GLOUCESTER
GL2 9RG
- Phone:
- 01452526032
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window