Financial history THE ST. PAUL'S ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 301664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58 £58 £6 £452 £466
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A