THE DAME EMILY PLAYGROUND

Charity Number: 301687
Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide open space and amenity provision for the public

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRISTOL CITY COUNCIL Trustee
SHIREHAMPTON PUBLIC HALL
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
WILLIAM COTTERELL'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
PAUL FISHER'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
LADY ELIZABETH ASTRY'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
BEDMINSTER LIBRARY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
AVONMOUTH PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
SPARKE EVANS PARK
Received: On time
MINA ROAD PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
THE RED LODGE
Charity reporting is overdue by 1569 days
GREVILLE SMYTH PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
PORTLAND SQUARE, PUBLIC OPEN SPACE
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
REDCLIFFE OPEN SPACE
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
THE GEORGIAN HOUSE
Charity reporting is overdue by 1569 days
MAUDLIN STREET SCHOOL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
BEDMINSTER DOWN AND LOVERS
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2022 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Operational Coordinator
BRISTOL PARKS
Block 15 unit 9
Cater Road
BRISTOL
BS13 7TW
Phone:
01179222100
Email:
No information available