LOCKLEAZE GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a sports ground/open space for thr benefit of the citizens of Bristol and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 28 January 1964: Standard registration
- THE COMBINATION GROUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY STEVEN DOUGLAS TYLER FCA | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Terence David Tovey | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gwyn Leyshon | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN BARRY REED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £2.51k | £2.53k | £13.54k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £50 | £0 | £0 | £994 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1952 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 26 APRIL 1996 AND 9 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL WELL BEING OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RECREATION.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HOME FARM WAY
EASTER COMPTON
BRISTOL
BS35 5SE
- Phone:
- 01454633459
- Email:
- jsdtyler@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window